05/24/2011 | File Number 842 | |||
05/24/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/16/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/28/2011 | File Number 668 | |||
04/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 408 | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/28/2011 | Public Hearing 04/01 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |