05/25/2011 | Motion Failed JF | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
04/26/2011 | File Number 634 | |||
04/26/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 392 | |||
04/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/31/2011 | Public Hearing 04/04 | |||
03/30/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |