04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 361 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/05/2012 | File Number 3 | |||
03/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 44 | |||
03/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/27/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/05/12 10:00 AM | |||
02/21/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/21/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2012 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
02/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |