|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Public Act 12-17
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
File Number 595
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 434
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3976
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
File Number 226
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
House Calendar Number 194
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|