|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-193
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 527
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 5476
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4865
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3712
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
File Number 78
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
House Calendar Number 90
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|