|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Public Act 12-31
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
File Number 301
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 235
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 2871
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
File Number 4
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
House Calendar Number 47
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/05/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/10/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|