|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-156
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 394
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
File Number 562
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3348
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
File Number 247
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 200
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|