|
05/03/2012
|
File Number 623
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 467
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3109
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
File Number 91
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
House Calendar Number 103
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|