06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Public Act 12-159 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 418 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/19/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/19/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 305 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 246 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/29/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/14/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |