05/14/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/09/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/09/2012 | Public Act 12-32 | |||
05/03/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/03/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 363 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/29/2012 | File Number 169 | |||
03/29/2012 | House Calendar Number 136 | |||
03/29/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |||
02/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |