|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-122
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
File Number 579
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 403
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3420
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
File Number 93
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
House Calendar Number 105
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|