04/20/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 392 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2012 | File Number 563 | |||
04/18/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/18/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3174 | |||
03/26/2012 | File Number 94 | |||
03/26/2012 | House Calendar Number 106 | |||
03/26/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/26/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/14/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/16/2012 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |||
02/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |