04/10/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/29/2012 | File Number 170 | |||
03/29/2012 | House Calendar Number 137 | |||
03/29/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |