|
05/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Public Act 12-16
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2012
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3829
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 242
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
File Number 171
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
House Calendar Number 138
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|