03/15/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/14/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/13/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/06/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/05/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/01/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |