|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-161
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
File Number 630
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 482
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4489
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
File Number 206
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
House Calendar Number 174
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Housing
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|