|
05/04/2012
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4376
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 421
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
File Number 96
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
House Calendar Number 108
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|