05/09/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 533 | |||
05/09/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/08/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/08/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/08/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5514 | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 380 | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 290 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |