04/18/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
04/17/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/17/2012 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 209 | |||
04/02/2012 | House Calendar Number 177 | |||
04/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |