04/16/2012 | File Number 438 | |||
04/16/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/16/2012 | New File by Committee on Banks | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/28/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Banks | |||
03/20/2012 | File Number 52 | |||
03/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 73 | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/08/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |