03/08/2012 | File Number 20 | |||
03/08/2012 | House Calendar Number 59 | |||
03/08/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/08/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/12 5:00 PM | |||
02/29/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/28/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |