|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-80
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
File Number 602
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 445
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3360
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
File Number 457
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
House Calendar Number 354
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|