05/03/2012 | File Number 624 | |||
05/03/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 466 | |||
05/03/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/02/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
05/02/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |||
05/02/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4564 | |||
05/02/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4497 | |||
04/18/2012 | File Number 501 | |||
04/18/2012 | House Calendar Number 377 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |