06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-124 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/09/2012 | Rules Suspended | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 526 | |||
05/09/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/08/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/08/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 286 | |||
04/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 219 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |