04/18/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Environment | |||
03/07/2012 | File Number 15 | |||
03/07/2012 | House Calendar Number 57 | |||
03/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/07/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/12 5:00 PM | |||
02/27/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |