LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05171
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05171
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2012 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05171
Action History
03/15/2012
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
03/14/2012
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
03/14/2012
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/09/2012
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/08/2012
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
02/24/2012
Public Hearing 02/28
02/16/2012
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs