04/17/2012 | File Number 480 | |||
04/17/2012 | House Calendar Number 356 | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/14/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/09/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/29/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |