03/30/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 174 | |||
03/30/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/22/2012 | File Number 81 | |||
03/22/2012 | House Calendar Number 93 | |||
03/22/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/22/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/12/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/29/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |