04/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 386 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/29/2012 | File Number 179 | |||
03/29/2012 | House Calendar Number 146 | |||
03/29/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |