03/28/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/19/2012 | File Number 41 | |||
03/19/2012 | House Calendar Number 69 | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |