|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Public Act 12-49
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3161
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 238
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
File Number 138
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
House Calendar Number 117
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|