04/09/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 239 | |||
04/09/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/04/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/22/2012 | File Number 82 | |||
03/22/2012 | House Calendar Number 94 | |||
03/22/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/22/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/13/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/27 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |