|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-127
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
File Number 635
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 480
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4809
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
File Number 248
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 201
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|