06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-128 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/23/2012 | File Number 582 | |||
04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 406 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/20/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 2733 | |||
03/21/2012 | File Number 61 | |||
03/21/2012 | House Calendar Number 82 | |||
03/21/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/13/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |