03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/16/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/15/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
03/09/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/08/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/06/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |