04/24/2012 | File Number 592 | |||
04/24/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/24/2012 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/03/2012 | File Number 228 | |||
04/03/2012 | House Calendar Number 195 | |||
04/03/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/27/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/20/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |