06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-129 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 553 | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 376 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/17/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3052 | |||
03/20/2012 | File Number 57 | |||
03/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 78 | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/20/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/07/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/06/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |