04/11/2012 | File Number 348 | |||
04/11/2012 | House Calendar Number 274 | |||
04/11/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/04/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |