06/06/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/23/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2012 | Public Act 12-85 | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/08/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 456 | |||
05/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 309 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 250 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |