05/01/2012 | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 388 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/27/2012 | File Number 142 | |||
03/27/2012 | House Calendar Number 121 | |||
03/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/27/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/14/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |