|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-195
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 518
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4910
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
File Number 503
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Calendar Number 379
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Commerce
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|