|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Public Act 12-87
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 402
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
File Number 566
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3314
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
File Number 143
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
House Calendar Number 122
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|