03/15/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Act 12-3 | |||
03/06/2012 | Signed by Governor in Original | |||
02/29/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | |||
02/29/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
02/29/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
02/29/2012 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
02/24/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 40 | |||
02/24/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
02/23/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
02/23/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 1458 | |||
02/22/2012 | Emergency Certification |