04/05/2012 | File Number 292 | |||
04/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 225 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/24/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |