05/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 460 | |||
05/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/30/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 539 | |||
04/19/2012 | House Calendar Number 394 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |||
02/28/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |