|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-196
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 521
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5199
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 389
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
House Calendar Number 299
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|