04/23/2012 | File Number 571 | |||
04/23/2012 | House Calendar Number 434 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/23/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/22/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/21/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/14/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |||
02/29/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |