|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-173
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 455
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3873
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
File Number 183
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
House Calendar Number 150
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|