|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-179
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 534
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5522
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
File Number 568
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
House Calendar Number 435
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|