|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-133
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
File Number 642
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 508
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4854
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
File Number 443
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
House Calendar Number 340
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|